+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On June 8, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Substituted By S5478
On June 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.44
- Rules Report Cal.44
- Reported
On June 2, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On January 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Election Law
On May 29, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.494
On May 28, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On March 11, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Election Law
+ − Sponsors (59)
Type:
Primary Sponsor