+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On April 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed Chap.27
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On January 23, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.10
- Substituted For A783
- Referred To Education
On January 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.37
- Reported And Committed To Rules
On January 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred To Education
+ − Votes (3)
January 23, 2019: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 60
- Present/NV: 3
January 22, 2019: Committee Vote (Senate Education)
- Yeas: 15
January 22, 2019: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 18
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (41)
Type:
Primary Sponsor