+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On January 28, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Signed Chap.4
On January 27, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Governor
On January 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- 3rd Reading Cal.47
- Substituted For S894
On January 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
On January 12, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.5
- Rules Report Cal.5
- Reported
- Reported Referred To Rules
On January 6, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Insurance
+ − Vote
January 20, 2021: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 63
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor