+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (24)
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB948 is now Act 1098
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- ORDERED ENROLLED
- Returned from the House as passed.
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- Returned To the Senate as passed.
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on INSURANCE & COMMERCE- HOUSE
On April 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment.
- Amendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Rules suspended.
- Read the third time and passed.
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 2
On March 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Senate Committee on Insurance and Commerce
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment.
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Insurance and Commerce
- Filed
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment S2
Sponsored by J. Woods
Amendment S1
Sponsored by J. Woods
+ − Votes (2)
April 8, 2013: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 85
- Present/NV: 15
April 1, 2013: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 35
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor