+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 7, 1994 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0339)
On April 5, 1994 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 339 (effective 7/1/94)
On March 29, 1994 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 28, 1994 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 21, 1994 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB428ER)
On March 8, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On March 7, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On March 6, 1994 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 1994 in the Senate:
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
On February 16, 1994 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed LD2793350 (HB428E)
On February 15, 1994 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (73-Y 4-N)
- Read third time and passed House (73-Y 4-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 14, 1994 in the House:
- Read first time
- Reported from C. J. with amendment (20-Y 2-N)
On February 4, 1994 in the House:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: 1
On January 24, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented and ordered printed
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
March 8, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
March 7, 1994: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
March 6, 1994: Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 0-N)
February 15, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE (73-Y 4-N)
February 14, 1994: Reported from C. J. with amendment (20-Y 2-N)
+ − Sponsors (23)
Type:
Primary Sponsor