+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (40)
On April 4, 1997 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0798)
On April 2, 1997 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
On April 2, 1997 in the Senate:
- Reading of Governor's communication waived
- Senate concurred in Gov's recommendation (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: AGREE TO GOV'S RECOMM. (39-Y 0-N)
On April 2, 1997 in the House:
- Enacted, Chapter 798 (effective 4/2/97)
- House concurred in Gov's rec. (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
On April 2, 1997 in the Senate:
- Emergency clause added by Governor's recommendation
- Governor's recommendation adopted
- Reenrolled
- Reenrolled bill text (SB1014ER)
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 2, 1997 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On March 24, 1997 in the Senate:
- Governor's recommendation received by Senate
On March 6, 1997 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 5, 1997 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 4, 1997 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On February 26, 1997 in the Senate:
- Reenrolled bill text (SB1014ER)
On February 19, 1997 in the House:
- Read third time
- Passed House (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 1997 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 17, 1997 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 1997 in the House:
- Assigned to General Laws sub-committee: 6
On January 29, 1997 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Read first time
On January 28, 1997 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On January 27, 1997 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
On January 24, 1997 in the Senate:
- Printed as engrossed 973483620-E
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read second time
On January 23, 1997 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 1997 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws with amds. (15-Y 0-N)
On January 17, 1997 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Presented & ordered printed 973483620
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (7)
April 2, 1997: VOTE: AGREE TO GOV'S RECOMM. (39-Y 0-N)
April 2, 1997: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
February 19, 1997: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 17, 1997: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
January 27, 1997: VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N)
January 23, 1997: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
January 22, 1997: Reported from General Laws with amds. (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor