+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 20, 2000 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ195ER)
On March 6, 2000 in the House:
- Agreed to by House (95-Y 1-N)
- Taken up
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 1-N)
On March 2, 2000 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws (25-Y 0-N)
On February 22, 2000 in the House:
- Assigned to General Laws sub-committee: 5
On February 21, 2000 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Placed on Calendar
On February 11, 2000 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- Read third time and agreed to by Senate by voice vote
On February 10, 2000 in the Senate:
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read second time
- Printed as engrossed 005729476-E
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
On February 9, 2000 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2000 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules with amendments by voice vote
On January 24, 2000 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Presented & ordered printed 005729476
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
March 6, 2000: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 1-N)
March 2, 2000: Reported from General Laws (25-Y 0-N)
February 9, 2000: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor