+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (52)
On April 17, 1996 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0835)
On April 8, 1996 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 835 (effective 7/1/96)
On March 28, 1996 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 26, 1996 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 25, 1996 in the House:
- Enrolled
On March 20, 1996 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB31ER)
On March 9, 1996 in the Senate:
- VOTE: ADOPT CONFERENCE REPORT (36-Y 0-N)
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (36-Y 0-N)
- Reading of conference report waived
On March 9, 1996 in the House:
- Conference substitute printed 964735180-H2
- Sub. recommended by conference comm. 964735180-H2
- House and Senate sub. rej. by conference comm.
- VOTE: ADOPTION (86-Y 0-N)
- Conference report agreed to by House (86-Y 0-N)
On March 7, 1996 in the House:
- Conferees appointed by House
- House acceded to request
On March 7, 1996 in the Senate:
- Senators: Holland, Wampler, Stosch
On March 7, 1996 in the House:
- Delegates: Croshaw, Dickinson, Callahan
On March 7, 1996 in the Senate:
- Conferees appointed by Senate
On March 6, 1996 in the Senate:
- Senate requested conference committee
- VOTE: INSIST & REQUEST (39-Y 0-N)
- Senate insisted on substitute (39-Y 0-N)
On March 4, 1996 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (3-Y 92-N)
- Senate substitute rejected by House (3-Y 92-N)
On March 1, 1996 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 29, 1996 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Engrossed by Senate - comm. sub. 964717180-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 964717180-S1
- Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N)
- Rec. of passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N)
On February 28, 1996 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 27, 1996 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 964717180-S1
- Reported from Finance with substitute (17-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 1996 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Read first time
On February 16, 1996 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 1996 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. 964171208-H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 964171208-H1
- Read second time
On February 14, 1996 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 13, 1996 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 964171208-H1
- Reported from Appropriations with sub. (21-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 1996 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Presented & ordered printed 967173809