+ − Full Texts (9)
+ − Actions (10)
On June 13, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Approved P.L.2013, c.62.
On April 29, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (71-5-0)
- Substituted for A2756 (1R)
On March 7, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
On December 10, 2012 in the Assembly:
- Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
On October 11, 2012 in the Assembly:
- Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee
On October 4, 2012 in the Senate:
- Passed by the Senate (35-0)
On September 20, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
- Transferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
On February 6, 2012 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee
+ − Votes (5)
April 29, 2013: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 71
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 4
April 29, 2013: SUBSTITUTE FOR A2756 Aca
- Present/NV: 80
March 7, 2013: r/favorably
- Yeas: 9
October 4, 2012: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 35
- Present/NV: 5
September 20, 2012: r/Sca
- Yeas: 12
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor