+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (7)
On August 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Absolute Veto, Received in the Senate
On June 24, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (77-0-0)
- Substituted for A1331 (1R)
On June 20, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
On June 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed by the Senate (39-0)
On June 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
On May 3, 2012 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
+ − Votes (4)
June 24, 2013: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 3
June 24, 2013: SUBSTITUTE FOR A1331 Aca
- Present/NV: 80
June 20, 2013: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
June 13, 2013: r/Sca
- Yeas: 12
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (24)
Type:
Primary Sponsor