+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On June 1, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Signed Chap.43
On May 20, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Governor
On May 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- 3rd Reading Cal.731
- Substituted For S6979
On March 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Elections
On March 14, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On March 10, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.442
On March 9, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On January 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Election Law
On May 20, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Election Law
+ − Vote
May 18, 2016: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 58
- Present/NV: 5
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor