+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On May 4, 2000 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0886)
On April 9, 2000 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 886 (effective 7/1/00)
On March 10, 2000 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 9, 2000 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 7, 2000 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1536ER)
On February 24, 2000 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 23, 2000 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
On February 22, 2000 in the Senate:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (14-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 2000 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 14, 2000 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Passed House (Block Vote) (98-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (Block Vote) (97-Y 0-N)
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 13, 2000 in the House:
- Read first time
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (18-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2000 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Presented & ordered printed 007318210
- Introduced at the request of Governor