+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (34)
On May 3, 2000 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0856)
On April 9, 2000 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 856 (effective 7/1/00)
On March 22, 2000 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 20, 2000 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 20, 2000 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 16, 2000 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB382ER)
On March 6, 2000 in the Senate:
- Reading of amendment waived
- House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (40-Y 0-N)
On March 2, 2000 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 2-N)
- Passed House with amendment (95-Y 2-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Emergency clause deleted
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read third time
On March 1, 2000 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
- Read third time
On February 29, 2000 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 28, 2000 in the House:
- Reported from P. & E. w/amendment (22-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 2000 in the House:
- Assigned to P. & E. sub-committee:2
On January 26, 2000 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 26, 2000 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE (38-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (38-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
- Read second time and engrossed
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED (38-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 2000 in the Senate:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (14-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 2000 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Presented & ordered printed w/emg clause 006902560
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (7)
March 6, 2000: VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (40-Y 0-N)
March 2, 2000: VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 2-N)
February 28, 2000: Reported from P. & E. w/amendment (22-Y 0-N)
January 26, 2000: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (38-Y 0-N)
January 26, 2000: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED (38-Y 0-N)
January 26, 2000: VOTE: PASSAGE (38-Y 0-N)
January 25, 2000: Reported from Privileges and Elections (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor