+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (40)
On March 19, 1996 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0158)
On March 11, 1996 in the Senate:
- Reenrolled bill text (SB330ER)
On March 8, 1996 in the House:
- Enacted, Chapter 158 (effective 7/1/96)
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On March 8, 1996 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
- Reenrolled
On March 8, 1996 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
- House concurred in Gov's recommendation (97-Y 0-N)
On March 7, 1996 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Gov's recommendation (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: ADOPT GOV. RECOMM. (40-Y 0-N)
- Governor's substitute printed 966445812-S1
- Amended as sub. by Gov's recommendation 966445812-S1
On March 6, 1996 in the Senate:
- Governor's recommendation received by Senate
On February 28, 1996 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 27, 1996 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 27, 1996 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On February 19, 1996 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB330ER)
On February 19, 1996 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (84-Y 14-N)
- Passed House (84-Y 14-N)
- Read third time
On February 16, 1996 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 15, 1996 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws (14-Y 4-N)
On February 9, 1996 in the House:
- Assigned to General Laws sub-committee: 4
On February 1, 1996 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Read first time
On January 31, 1996 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On January 30, 1996 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE (35-Y 5-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (35-Y 5-N)
On January 29, 1996 in the Senate:
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read second time
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Printed as engrossed 960216693-E
On January 26, 1996 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp. (39-Y 0-N), passed by for the day
On January 25, 1996 in the Senate:
- Reported from Ed. & H. with amendments (13-Y 2-N)
On January 23, 1996 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Ed. & Health sub-committee: Health Professions
On January 19, 1996 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Presented & ordered printed 960216693
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (7)
March 8, 1996: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
March 7, 1996: VOTE: ADOPT GOV. RECOMM. (40-Y 0-N)
February 19, 1996: VOTE: PASSAGE (84-Y 14-N)
February 15, 1996: Reported from General Laws (14-Y 4-N)
January 30, 1996: VOTE: PASSAGE (35-Y 5-N)
January 26, 1996: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
January 25, 1996: Reported from Ed. & H. with amendments (13-Y 2-N)
+ − Sponsors (65)
Type:
Primary Sponsor