+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On May 1, 1998 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0683)
On April 16, 1998 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 683 (effective 7/1/98)
On March 11, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 10, 1998 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 9, 1998 in the House:
- Enrolled
On March 3, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB568ER)
On February 26, 1998 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (37-Y 1-N 1-A)
- Passed Senate (37-Y 1-N 1-A)
- Read third time
On February 25, 1998 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (40-Y 0-N)
On February 24, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government (13-Y 1-N 1-A)
On February 17, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
On February 16, 1998 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 1998 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. 986466320-H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 986466320-H1
- Read second time
- Committee substitute printed 986466320-H1
On February 14, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 13, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from C. C. T. with sub. (22-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to C. C. T. sub-committee: 3
On January 21, 1998 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
- Presented & ordered printed 980471320
+ − Votes (5)
February 26, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE R (37-Y 1-N 1-A)
February 25, 1998: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
February 24, 1998: Reported from Local Government (13-Y 1-N 1-A)
February 16, 1998: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 13, 1998: Reported from C. C. T. with sub. (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor