+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (63)
On May 12, 1998 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0802)
On April 23, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reenrolled bill text (SB588ER)
On April 22, 1998 in the House:
- Enacted, Chapter 802 (effective 7/1/98)
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On April 22, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
- Reenrolled
- Governor's recommendation adopted
On April 22, 1998 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE-ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
- House concurred in Gov's recom. (Block vote) (99-Y 0-N)
On April 22, 1998 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Gov's recommendation (39-Y 0-N)
- Placed on Calendar
- VOTE: ADOPT GOV. RECOMM. R (39-Y 0-N)
On April 16, 1998 in the Senate:
- Governor's recommendation received by Senate
On April 8, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 6, 1998 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 6, 1998 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On April 2, 1998 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB588ER)
On March 12, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reading of amendments waived
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENTS R (40-Y 0-N)
- House amendments agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On March 10, 1998 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (64-Y 35-N)
- Passed House with amendments (64-Y 35-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Pending question ordered
- Motion for pending question agreed to
- VOTE: (36-Y 62-N)
- Motion to rerefer to committee rejected (36-Y 62-N)
- Amendments by Mr. Tate agreed to
- Amendment by Mr. Joannou agreed to
- Read third time
On March 9, 1998 in the House:
- Read third time
- Motion for pending question rejected
- Sub by Mr. Grayson rejected 987158236-H1 (12-Y 87-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (12-Y 87-N)
- Amendments by Mr. Joannou agreed to
- Substitute by Mr. Grayson withdrawn 987158236-H1
- Pending question, not ordered
- Amendments by Mr. Joannou reconsidered
- Amendments by Mr. Joannou withdrawn
- Passed by for the day
- Floor substitute printed 987158236-H1 (Grayson)
On March 6, 1998 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
- Read third time
On March 5, 1998 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On March 4, 1998 in the House:
- Read second time
On March 3, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Tra. (22-Y 4-N)
On February 20, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to Tra. sub-committee: 2
On February 13, 1998 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Read first time
On February 12, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 11, 1998 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 1998 in the Senate:
- Printed as engrossed 986243236-E
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read second time
On February 9, 1998 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation w/amd. (15-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 1998 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Presented & ordered printed 986243236
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (10)
April 22, 1998: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE-ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
April 22, 1998: VOTE: ADOPT GOV. RECOMM. R (39-Y 0-N)
March 12, 1998: VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENTS R (40-Y 0-N)
March 10, 1998: VOTE: (36-Y 62-N)
March 10, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE (64-Y 35-N)
March 9, 1998: VOTE: ADOPTION (12-Y 87-N)
March 3, 1998: Reported from Tra. (22-Y 4-N)
February 11, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
February 9, 1998: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
February 5, 1998: Reported from Transportation w/amd. (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor