+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (8)
On January 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Approved P.L.2017, c.271.
On December 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (36-0)
- Substituted for S3361
On December 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
On June 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
On June 22, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Passed by the Assembly (75-0-0)
On June 19, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
On June 20, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee
+ − Votes (5)
December 18, 2017: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 36
- Present/NV: 4
December 18, 2017: SUBSTITUTE FOR S3361
- Present/NV: 40
December 4, 2017: r/favorably
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 4
June 22, 2017: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 75
- Present/NV: 5
June 19, 2017: r/Aca
- Yeas: 10
- Present/NV: 3