+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (9)
On January 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Approved P.L.2017, c.261.
On December 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (32-0)
- Substituted for S1030
On December 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
On June 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
On June 22, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Passed by the Assembly (67-8-1)
On April 4, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
On February 22, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
On January 27, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee
+ − Votes (5)
December 18, 2017: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 32
- Present/NV: 8
December 18, 2017: SUBSTITUTE FOR S1030
- Present/NV: 40
December 4, 2017: r/favorably
- Yeas: 12
June 22, 2017: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 67
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 4
April 4, 2016: r/favorably
- Yeas: 9
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor