+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On May 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmitted as directed
- Remarks see Senate Journal Page 443
- Adopted
On May 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Re-reported as committed
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported as amended
On February 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to PUBLIC HEALTH AND WELFARE
- Motion to Re-refer to PUBLIC HEALTH AND WELFARE
On February 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor