+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On April 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to TRANSPORTATION
On March 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- In the House
- Remarks see Senate Journal Page 1558
- Third consideration and final passage
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second consideration
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On June 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to TRANSPORTATION
+ − Vote
March 31, 2014: Senate Floor Vote: SB 997 PN 1177, FINAL PASSAGE
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor