+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On November 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Act No. 111
- Approved by the Governor
On October 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- Presented to the Governor
- Signed in House
On October 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed in Senate
- Remarks see Senate Journal Page ....
- Senate concurred in House amendments (47-0)
- Re-reported on concurrence, as committed
- Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage (201-0)
- Re-reported as committed
On October 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On September 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Removed from table
On September 29, 2020 in the Senate:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On May 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to JUDICIARY
On May 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- In the House
- Remarks see Senate Journal Page 353-356
- Third consideration and final passage (49-0)
On April 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Re-reported as committed
On February 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On January 29, 2020 in the Senate:
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On December 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to JUDICIARY
+ − Analysis
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (4)
October 21, 2020: House Floor Vote: SB 976 PN 2023, FP
October 21, 2020: Senate Floor Vote: SB 976 PN 2023, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS
May 12, 2020: Senate Floor Vote: SB 976 PN 1481, FINAL PASSAGE
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor