+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On February 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to EDUCATION
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- In the House
- Third consideration and final passage (47-0)
On January 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Re-reported as amended
On January 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On December 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On November 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to EDUCATION
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
February 5, 2018: Senate Floor Vote: SB 955 PN 1450, FINAL PASSAGE
+ − Sponsors (25)
Type:
Primary Sponsor