+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On November 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to URBAN AFFAIRS
On October 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- In the House
- Third consideration and final passage (49-0)
On September 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second consideration
On September 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Re-reported as committed
On July 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
On June 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On June 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to TRANSPORTATION
+ − Vote
October 19, 2015: Senate Floor Vote: SB 931 PN 1143, FINAL PASSAGE
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor