+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On January 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
On January 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- In the House
- Remarks see Senate Journal Page 82-83
- Third consideration and final passage (49-0)
On January 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Remarks see Senate Journal Page 44
- Amended on third consideration
- Re-reported as committed
On October 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On October 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On October 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Vote
January 28, 2020: Senate Floor Vote: SB 910 PN 1470, FINAL PASSAGE
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor