+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (28)
On July 1, 2020 in the Senate:
- Act No. 36
- Approved by the Governor
On June 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Presented to the Governor
- Signed in Senate
On June 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed in House
- House concurred in Senate amendments to House amendments (199-3)
- Re-reported on concurrence, as committed
On June 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to RULES
On June 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- In the House
- Senate concurred in House amendments, as amended by the Senate (50-0)
- Re-reported on concurrence, as amended
On December 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS
On December 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage (194-1)
On December 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Re-reported as amended
On November 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On November 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Removed from table
On November 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On October 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to APPROPRIATIONS
On October 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- In the House
- Third consideration and final passage (48-0)
On October 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second consideration, with amendments
On October 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On October 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to APPROPRIATIONS
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Votes (4)
June 10, 2020: House Floor Vote: SB 905 PN 1754, CONCUR
December 17, 2019: House Floor Vote: SB 905 PN 1430, FP
October 30, 2019: Senate Floor Vote: SB 905 PN 1336, FINAL PASSAGE
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor