+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On March 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Act No. 26
- Approved by the Governor
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Presented to the Governor
- Signed in House
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed in Senate
- Senate concurred in House amendments
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Re-reported on concurrence, as committed
- Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS
On March 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Re-reported as committed
On March 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second consideration, with amendments
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
- Remarks see House Journal Page 184
On January 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Removed from table
On December 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Laid on the table
On November 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Removed from table
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On October 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to GAME AND FISHERIES
On October 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- In the House
- Third consideration and final passage
On October 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second consideration
On October 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On April 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to GAME AND FISHERIES