+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (25)
On November 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Act No. 70
- Approved by the Governor
On November 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Presented to the Governor
On November 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed in House
On November 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed in Senate
- Senate concurred in House amendments (49-0)
- Re-reported on concurrence, as committed
On November 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS
On November 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage (196-1)
- Re-reported as committed
On October 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second consideration
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
On October 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Removed from table
On October 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On July 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to TRANSPORTATION
On June 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- In the House
- Remarks see Senate Journal Page 829
- Third consideration and final passage (49-0)
On June 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second consideration
On June 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On June 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to TRANSPORTATION
+ − Votes (3)
November 17, 2015: Senate Floor Vote: SB 887 PN 1364, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS
November 9, 2015: House Floor Vote: SB 887 PN 1364, FP
June 30, 2015: Senate Floor Vote: SB 887 PN 1040, FINAL PASSAGE
+ − Sponsors (20)
Type:
Primary Sponsor