+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On July 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT
On June 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- In the House
- Third consideration and final passage (49-0)
On June 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second consideration
On June 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On June 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT