+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (20)
On June 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor
- Act No. 26
On June 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Presented to the Governor
On June 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed in House
- Signed in Senate
On June 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third consideration and final passage
- Re-reported as committed
On June 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On June 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Removed from table
On June 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported as committed
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
On May 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to JUDICIARY
On May 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- In the House
- Third consideration and final passage
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second consideration
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to JUDICIARY
+ − Votes (5)
June 18, 2013: House Floor Vote: SB 865 PN 976, FP
May 6, 2013: Senate Floor Vote: SB 865 PN 976, FINAL PASSAGE
April 30, 2013: Senate Judiciary Vote: Senate Bill 865 - Reported as Committed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor