+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On June 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to EDUCATION
On June 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- In the House
- Third consideration and final passage (49-0)
On June 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Amended on third consideration
On June 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second consideration
On June 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Re-reported as amended
On June 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
On June 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On June 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to EDUCATION
+ − Vote
June 28, 2015: Senate Floor Vote: SB 862 PN 1129, FINAL PASSAGE
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor