+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On October 26, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
On October 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Remarks see Senate Journal Page ....
- Third consideration and final passage (49-0)
On October 19, 2022 in the Senate:
- Re-reported as committed
On June 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On June 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On July 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
+ − Analysis
+ − Vote
October 25, 2022: Senate Floor Vote: SB 822 PN 1001, Final Passage
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor