+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On October 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
On October 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- In the House
- Third consideration and final passage (50-0)
On October 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-reported as committed
On October 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On September 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On June 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
+ − Vote
October 25, 2017: Senate Floor Vote: SB 822 PN 1046, FINAL PASSAGE
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor