+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On September 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On September 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Removed from table
On July 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Laid on the table
On June 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
+ − Vote
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor