+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On July 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor
- Act No. 1A
On June 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Presented to the Governor
- Signed in House
- Signed in Senate
- Third consideration and final passage (195-0)
- Re-reported as committed
On June 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On June 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Removed from table
On June 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported as committed
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
On June 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to APPROPRIATIONS
On June 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- In the House
- Third consideration and final passage (49-0)
On June 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second consideration
On June 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On May 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to APPROPRIATIONS
+ − Votes (2)
June 30, 2015: House Floor Vote: SB 812 PN 1078, FP
June 25, 2015: Senate Floor Vote: SB 812 PN 1078, FINAL PASSAGE
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor