+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (23)
On May 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Act No. 27
- Approved by the Governor
On May 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Presented to the Governor
- Signed in Senate
On May 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed in House
On May 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Remarks see House Journal Page 692
- Third consideration and final passage (181-18)
On March 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Removed from table
- Laid on the table
On December 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Re-reported as committed
On December 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second consideration
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
On December 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Removed from table
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On June 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to APPROPRIATIONS
On June 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- In the House
- Third consideration and final passage (49-0)
On June 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second consideration
On June 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On May 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to APPROPRIATIONS
+ − Votes (2)
May 3, 2016: House Floor Vote: SB 811 PN 870, FP
June 25, 2015: Senate Floor Vote: SB 811 PN 870, FINAL PASSAGE
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor