+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (24)
On November 3, 2022 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor
- Act No. 154 of 2022
On October 26, 2022 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor
- Signed in House
- Signed in Senate
On October 25, 2022 in the House:
- Third consideration and final passage (200-0)
- Re-reported as committed
On October 24, 2022 in the House:
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On September 21, 2022 in the House:
- Removed from table
On September 20, 2022 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- Removed from table
On June 20, 2022 in the House:
- Reported as committed
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
On March 8, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE
On February 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Remarks see Senate Journal Page 113
- Third consideration and final passage (49-0)
On January 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Re-reported as committed
On December 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On November 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On July 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT