+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (20)
On May 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor
- Act No. 4
On May 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Presented to the Governor
On May 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed in House
- Signed in Senate
On May 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third consideration and final passage (194-0)
- Re-reported as committed
On April 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Removed from table
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported as committed
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
On February 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to TRANSPORTATION
On January 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- In the House
- Third consideration and final passage (48-0)
On January 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second consideration
On January 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On January 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to TRANSPORTATION
+ − Votes (2)
May 4, 2015: House Floor Vote: SB 79 PN 55, FP
January 27, 2015: Senate Floor Vote: SB 79 PN 55, FINAL PASSAGE
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor