+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (22)
On October 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS
On October 25, 2022 in the House:
- Remarks see House Journal Page ....
- Third consideration and final passage (106-94)
- Re-reported as committed
On October 24, 2022 in the House:
- Remarks see House Journal Page ....
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration, with amendments
On September 21, 2022 in the House:
- Removed from table
On February 9, 2022 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- Removed from table
On November 15, 2021 in the House:
- Reported as amended
- First consideration
- Laid on the table
On October 21, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to EDUCATION
On October 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Remarks see Senate Journal Page 1016-1017
- Third consideration and final passage (29-20)
On October 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Re-reported as committed
On September 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On September 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On June 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to EDUCATION