+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (24)
On December 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Act No. 81
- Approved by the Governor
On December 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Presented to the Governor
- Signed in House
- Signed in Senate
- Third consideration and final passage (186-2)
On December 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-reported as committed
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On December 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Removed from table
On December 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported as committed
- First consideration
- Laid on the table
On September 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to COMMERCE
On September 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- In the House
- Third consideration and final passage (50-0)
On July 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Removed from table
- Laid on the table
On June 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-reported as committed
On June 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On June 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On June 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to BANKING AND INSURANCE
+ − Votes (2)
December 13, 2017: House Floor Vote: SB 751 PN 925, FP
September 20, 2017: Senate Floor Vote: SB 751 PN 925, FINAL PASSAGE
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor