+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On September 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Removed from table
On February 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Laid on the table
On December 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Removed from table
- Laid on the table
On November 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Removed from table
- Laid on the table
On October 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Removed from table
On October 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported as amended
- First consideration
- Laid on the table
On June 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to GAME AND FISHERIES
On June 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- In the House
- Third consideration and final passage (49-0)
On June 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second consideration
On June 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to GAME AND FISHERIES
+ − Vote
June 24, 2015: Senate Floor Vote: SB 737 PN 763, FINAL PASSAGE
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor