+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On July 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY
On June 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- In the House
- Third consideration and final passage (45-5)
On June 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Amended on third consideration
On June 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second consideration
On June 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Re-reported as committed
On April 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
On March 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On April 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY
+ − Vote
June 29, 2016: Senate Floor Vote: SB 703 PN 1999, FINAL PASSAGE
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor