+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On October 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
On October 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- In the House
- Third consideration and final passage (48-0)
On September 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second consideration
On September 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On September 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT