+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On June 30, 2021 in the House:
- Act No. 51 of 2021
- Approved by the Governor
On June 28, 2021 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor
On June 25, 2021 in the House:
- Signed in House
- Signed in Senate
- Third consideration and final passage (201-0)
- Re-reported as committed
On June 24, 2021 in the House:
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On June 15, 2021 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- Removed from table
On April 7, 2021 in the House:
- Removed from table
On April 6, 2021 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to TRANSPORTATION
On March 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third consideration and final passage (48-0)
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second consideration
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On January 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to TRANSPORTATION
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
June 25, 2021: House Floor Vote: SB 70 PN 228, FP
March 15, 2021: Senate Floor Vote: SB 70 PN 228, Final Passage
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor