+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (26)
On July 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Act No. 68
- Approved by the Governor
On June 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Presented to the Governor
On June 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed in House
- Signed in Senate
- Senate concurred in House amendments (50-0)
- Re-reported on concurrence, as committed
- Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS
On June 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage (201-0)
- Re-reported as committed
On June 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On June 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Removed from table
On June 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On June 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE
On June 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- In the House
- Third consideration and final passage (50-0)
On June 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Re-reported as committed
On June 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On June 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On May 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE