+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On November 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
On September 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Removed from table
On September 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
On June 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Removed from table
- Laid on the table
On April 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Removed from table
- Laid on the table
On January 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Re-reported as committed
On November 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On November 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On May 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY
+ − Analysis
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor