+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On April 12, 2022 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- Removed from table
On December 15, 2021 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On September 28, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT
On September 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third consideration and final passage (49-0)
On September 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Re-reported as committed
On June 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Remarks see Senate Journal Page 843
On June 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On June 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On May 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT