+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (31)
On October 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Act No. 40
- Approved by the Governor
On September 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Presented to the Governor
On September 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed in House
On September 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed in Senate
- Senate concurred in House amendments (47-0)
- Re-reported on concurrence, as committed
On September 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS
On July 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- In the Senate
- Remarks see House Journal Page 1456
- Third consideration and final passage (181-0)
- Re-reported as committed
On June 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Remarks see House Journal Page 1431
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration, with amendments
On June 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Removed from table
On June 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On June 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to JUDICIARY
On June 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- In the House
- Remarks see Senate Journal Page 715
- Third consideration and final passage (49-0)
On June 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Amended on third consideration
On June 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Remarks see Senate Journal Page 653
- Second consideration, with amendments
On June 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Re-reported as amended
On May 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
On May 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to JUDICIARY
+ − Votes (5)
September 17, 2015: Senate Floor Vote: SB 663 PN 1156, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS
July 21, 2015: House Floor Vote: SB 663 PN 1156, FP
June 30, 2015: House Floor Vote: SB 663 PN 1136, 2015 A3036, PETRARCA
June 24, 2015: Senate Floor Vote: SB 663 PN 1092, FINAL PASSAGE
+ − Sponsors (20)
Type:
Primary Sponsor