+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On December 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Remarks see House Journal Page 2105
- Re-referred to CONSUMER AFFAIRS
On December 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Remarks see House Journal Page 2056
On December 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Removed from table
On September 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Laid on the table
- Removed from table
On June 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On June 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT
On June 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- In the House
- Third consideration and final passage (50-0)
On June 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-reported as committed
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On June 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On May 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
December 12, 2017: House Floor Vote: SB 656 PN 978, MOT RECOM, CONSUMER AFFAIRS KAMPF
June 21, 2017: Senate Floor Vote: SB 656 PN 978, FINAL PASSAGE
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor