+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On June 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to HEALTH
On June 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- In the House
- Third consideration and final passage (49-0)
On June 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Remarks see Senate Journal Page 569
- Amended on third consideration
On May 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Re-reported as committed
On September 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On September 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Removed from table
On July 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
On June 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On May 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Vote
June 12, 2018: Senate Floor Vote: SB 655 PN 1850, FINAL PASSAGE
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor