+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (28)
On July 1, 2020 in the Senate:
- Act No. 53
- Approved by the Governor
On June 29, 2020 in the Senate:
- Presented to the Governor
- Signed in Senate
On June 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed in House
- Remarks see Senate Journal Page 662-663
- Senate concurred in House amendments (50-0)
- Re-reported on concurrence, as committed
- Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage (201-0)
- Re-reported as committed
On June 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration, with amendments
On June 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Removed from table
On June 15, 2020 in the Senate:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On December 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to JUDICIARY
On November 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- In the House
- Remarks see Senate Journal Page 1125
- Third consideration and final passage (49-0)
On November 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Re-reported as committed
On November 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration, with amendments
On October 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On May 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE
+ − Analysis
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (4)
June 24, 2020: House Floor Vote: SB 637 PN 1815, FP
June 23, 2020: House Floor Vote: SB 637 PN 1772, 2019 A6300, DELOZIER
November 21, 2019: Senate Floor Vote: SB 637 PN 1392, FINAL PASSAGE
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor